EP1951849 - PROCESS, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR PASSIVATING CARBONACEOUS MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deveraux Holdings Pty Ltd 28 The Esplanade Perth, Western Australia 6000 / AU | For all designated states Corky's Carbon and Combustion Pty Ltd 386 Maitland Road Mayfield, NSW 2304 / AU | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLEMAN, James 1/58 Mitchell Street Bondi Beach New South Wales 2026 / AU | 02 /
CORK, David 386 Maitland Road Mayfield NSW 2304 / AU | [2008/41] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
COLEMAN, James 28 The Esplanade Perth, Western Australia 6000 / AU | ||
02 /
CORK, David 386 Maitland Road Mayfield NSW 2304 / AU | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06790435.9 | 26.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006AU01604 | Priority number, date | AU20050905934 | 26.10.2005 Original published format: AU 2005905934 | AU20050906808 | 05.12.2005 Original published format: AU 2005906808 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007048198 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1951849 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C10L9/02, C10L5/00, C10L9/08, C10L9/10 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
C10L5/00 (EP,US);
C10L9/08 (EP,US);
C10L9/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | 23.05.2008 | BA | 23.05.2008 | HR | 23.05.2008 | MK | 23.05.2008 | RS | 23.05.2008 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PASSIVIERUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEN MATERIALIEN | [2008/32] | English: | PROCESS, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR PASSIVATING CARBONACEOUS MATERIALS | [2008/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET APPAREILLAGE SERVANT À PASSIVER DES MATIÈRES CARBONÉES | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 29.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/23] | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5322530 (MERRIAM NORMAN W [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,15-24,27-29,31,32,34,35,38,39,41,44-47,57,65 * process for upgrading coal by drying, contacting with tar in the gas phase and pyrolysing and quenching it; column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 57; figure 1; examples 2,3,4,5; claim 1 * [Y] 33,36,37 [I] 6,7,13,14,25,26,30,40,42,43,48; | [A]US4511363 (NAKAMURA YOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-48,57,65 * figure 1; example 2; claims 1-7,,9 *; | [Y]US5087269 (CHA CHANG Y [US], et al) [Y] 36,37 * figure 1; tables 2,3 *; | [Y]US4043763 (NORMAN OSCAR L, et al) [Y] 33 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 35 * | International search | [X]US5711769 (RINKER FRANKLIN GEORGE [US], et al); | [X]US4249909 (COMOLLI ALFRED G [US]); | [X]US5601692 (RINKER FRANKLIN G [US], et al); | [X]JPH0971791 ; | [X]US4043763 (NORMAN OSCAR L, et al); | [X]US5087269 (CHA CHANG Y [US], et al) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 21, Database accession no. 1997-231338, XP008117901 & JPH0971791 A 19970319 (TECH CALL PARTNERSHIP) |