EP1928730 - IMPROVED AIRSHIP&METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 21st Century Airship Technologies Inc. P.O. Box 177 Main Station Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 4X1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states 21st Century Airship Technologies Inc. Box 177 Main Station Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 4X1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLTING, Hokan S. 936 Portminster Court Newmarket Ontario L3X 1L8 / CA | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06790758.4 | 28.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006CA01594 | Priority number, date | US20050236569 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: US 236569 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007036038 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1928730 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 05.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B64B1/02, B64B1/40 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
B64B1/60 (EP,US);
B64B1/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES LUFTSCHIFF UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2008/24] | English: | IMPROVED AIRSHIP&METHOD OF OPERATION | [2008/24] | French: | AEROSTAT AMELIORE ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER CET AEROSTAT | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 26.11.2009 | [2010/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US6427943 (YOKOMAKU YOSHIO [JP], et al) [XD] 1-5,19-21 * column 7, line 33 - line 36 * * column 8, line 9; figure 3 * * column 8, line 50 - line 55 *[A] 6-18 | International search | [A]US2396494 (DONNELL LLOYD H, et al); | [A]US5294076 (COLTING HAKAN [CA]); | [A]CA2172269 ; | [X]US6427943 (YOKOMAKU YOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]US6698686 (OGAWA DAIHACHI [JP], et al); | [XP]US2006065777 (WALDEN MICHAEL K [US], et al) |