Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8317488 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2012 | B2 | US2009016908 | 15.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005040495 | 26.08.2005 | WO2006EP08340 | 25.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5027130B | Global Dossier | 19.09.2012 | B2 | JP2009506249 | 12.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005040495 | 26.08.2005 | WO2006EP08340 | 25.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1922485 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2016 | B1 | EP1922485 | 21.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005040495 | 26.08.2005 | WO2006EP08340 | 25.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101253327B | 28.07.2010 | B | CN101253327 | 27.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005040495 | 26.08.2005 | WO2006EP08340 | 25.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1123337 | 12.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005040495 | 26.08.2005 | WO2006EP08340 | 25.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007022988 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005040495 | 26.08.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005040495 | 24.08.2006 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102005040495 | 26.08.2005 |