EP1922485 - MULTI-CYLINDER, DRY-RUNNING PISTON COMPRESSOR COMPRISING A COOLING AIR FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2016/41] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTL, Michael Bürgermeister-Prenn-Str. 2a 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2016/41] |
Former [2008/21] | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG, Patentabteilung, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06791653.6 | 25.08.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006EP08340 | Priority number, date | DE20051040495 | 26.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005040495 | [2008/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007022988 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1922485 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1922485 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/06, F04B25/00 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
F04B25/00 (EP,US);
F04B39/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2008/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRZYLINDRIGER TROCKENLAUFENDER KOLBENVERDICHTER MIT EINEM KÜHLLUFTSTROM | [2008/21] | English: | MULTI-CYLINDER, DRY-RUNNING PISTON COMPRESSOR COMPRISING A COOLING AIR FLOW | [2008/21] | French: | COMPRESSEUR A PISTON FONCTIONNANT A SEC, A PLUSIEURS CYLINDRES, QUI PRESENTE UN FLUX D'AIR DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2006 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.08.2006 | |
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.08.2006 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 12.10.2016 | |
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1463769 (L.R.CORVISIER) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * figure 6 *; | [A]DE1403963 (BRAETSCH KURT) [A] 1 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR1108479 (R.PATERAS PESCARA) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE306576 (BROWN BOVERIE & CO) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |