EP1931528 - HYBRID DRIVE TRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZE, Bernd-Guido Menzelstrasse 2 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 02 /
HENKE, Markus Wilshoop 10 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 03 /
MARTIN, Sven Steinmetzweg 28 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | [2008/25] | Application number, filing date | 06791656.9 | 25.08.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006EP08343 | Priority number, date | DE20051046533 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005046533 | [2008/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007036275 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1931528 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60K/ | [2008/25] | CPC: |
B60K6/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/10 (US);
B60K6/448 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60L58/20 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W20/13 (US);
B60K17/02 (EP,US);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
B60L2210/10 (EP,US);
B60L2240/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/441 (EP,US);
B60L2260/12 (EP,US);
B60L2260/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | HYBRIDANTRIEBSSTRANG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2008/25] | English: | HYBRID DRIVE TRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2008/25] | French: | CHAINE DE TRANSMISSION HYBRIDE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE10163226 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DX] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0017] - [0024] * * figure 1 *; | [DX]DE4408719 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DX] 1-3 * column 4, lines 10-60 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5586613 (EHSANI MEHRDAD [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, lines 40-60 * * column 7, lines 20-60 * * figures 5,7 *; | [A]US2004204277 (DUAN ZHIHUI [US]) [A] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0025] , [0038] - [0044] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6705416 (GLONNER HANS [DE], et al) [A] 1,5-10 * column 1, lines 30-60 * * column 3, lines 5-40 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE10248715 | DE10158536 | DE4408719 | DE10163226 |