EP1926967 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE OBJECT STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Werth Messtechnik GmbH Siemensstrasse 19 35394 Giessen / DE | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRÄS, Matthias Am Mühlberg 30 61197 Florstadt / DE | 02 /
CHRISTOPH, Ralf Siemensstr. 19 35394 Giessen / DE | 03 /
NEUSCHÄFER-RUBE, Ulrich Am Horstbleek 53 38116 Braunschweig / DE | 04 /
RAUH, Wolfgang Am Mehrdrusch 16 35094 Lahntal / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans-Herbert Stoffregen Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11 b 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792130.4 | 19.09.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006EP09078 | Priority number, date | DE20051044961 | 20.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005044961 | DE20061001531 | 12.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006001531 | [2008/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007033811 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1926967 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
G01B5/012 (EP);
G01B11/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR MESSUNG VON STRUKTUREN EINES OBJEKTS | [2008/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE OBJECT STRUCTURES | [2008/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A LA MESURE DES STRUCTURES D'UN OBJET | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 11.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO9857121 (WERTH MESSTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-63 * abstract * * page 22 *; | [DA]DE29808683U (SCHWENKE HEINRICH DIPL ING [DE], et al) [DA] 2,3,31-33 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2 *; | [DA]DE4327250 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [DA] 13,14 * abstract * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 15 *; | [A]DE10258579 (CARL MAHR HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [A] 23,24,60,61 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9857121 | DE4327250 | US4972597 | WO9963301 | WO0225206 | DE29808683U | DE10258579 | - SCHWENKE ET AL., "Opto-taktiler Sensor zur 2D- und 3D-Messung kleiner Strukturen mit Koordinatenmessgeräten", DE.Z.: TM-TECHNISCHES MESSEN, (1999), vol. 66, no. 12, pages 1 - 5, XP000927938 |