EP1940817 - CHOLINERGIC ENHANCERS WITH IMPROVED BLOOD-BRAIN BARRIER PERMEABILITY FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES ACCOMPANIED BY COGNITIVE IMPAIRMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI, TR | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galantos Pharma GmbH Biotechnikum an der Goldgrube Freiligrathstrasse 12 55131 Mainz / DE | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAELICKE, Alfred Hinter der Hecke 1 55268 Nieder-Olm / DE | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Boeckh, Tobias, et al Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Boeckh, Tobias, et al HERTIN Anwaltssozietät Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Boeckh, Tobias HERTIN Anwaltssozietät Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792225.2 | 22.09.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006EP09220 | Priority number, date | EP20050020721 | 22.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05020721 | US20060780243P | 07.03.2006 Original published format: US 780243 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039138 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1940817 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940817 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/91, C07D491/06, A61K31/343, A61K31/55, A61P25/28, C07D307/00, C07D223/00 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D307/91 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHOLINERGE ENHANCER MIT VERBESSERTER DURCHGÄNGIGKEIT DURCH DIE BLUT-HIRN-SCHRANKE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN, DIE MIT KOGNITIVEN STÖRUNGEN EINHERGEHEN | [2008/28] | English: | CHOLINERGIC ENHANCERS WITH IMPROVED BLOOD-BRAIN BARRIER PERMEABILITY FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES ACCOMPANIED BY COGNITIVE IMPAIRMENT | [2008/28] | French: | AMPLIFICATEURS CHOLINERGIQUES DE PERMÉABILITÉ DE LA BARRIÈRE SANG-CERVEAU AMÉLIORÉE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES ACCOMPAGNÉES D'UNE DÉFICIENCE COGNITIVE | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 06.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.04.2011
16.05.2012
WITHDRAWN Sanochemia Pharmazeutika AG Boltzmanngasse 11 1090 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Beer, Manfred, et al, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | 02
07.04.2011
12.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Synaptech Inc. P. O. Box 157 Cold Spring Harbor NY 11724 / US Opponent's representative Richards, John, et al, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.04.2011
16.05.2012
WITHDRAWN Sanochemia Pharmazeutika AG Boltzmanngasse 11 1090 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Beer, Manfred, et al, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | ||
02
07.04.2011
12.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Synaptech Inc. P. O. Box 157 Cold Spring Harbor NY 11724 / US Opponent's representative Richards, John, et al, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.04.2011
13.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sanochemia Pharmazeutika AG Boltzmanngasse 11 1090 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Beer, Manfred, et al, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | ||
02
07.04.2011
12.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Synaptech Inc. P. O. Box 157 Cold Spring Harbor NY 11724 / US Opponent's representative Richards, John, et al, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.04.2011
WITHDRAWN Sanochemia Pharmazeutika AG Boltzmanngasse 11 1090 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Beer, Manfred, et al, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | 12.05.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.09.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.06.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/50] | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | LI | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | [2013/07] |
Former [2011/29] | EE | 07.07.2010 | |
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | EE | 07.07.2010 | |
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | BG | 07.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8808708 (BONNIE DAVIS [US]) [X] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0653427 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 30 * * tables I-III * * examples 2-17 * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]EP0648771 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 23 * * tables I-III * * examples 2-18 * * claims 1-8 *; | [X]EP1020470 (SYNAPTECH INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 31 * * tables I-III * * examples 2-21 * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]JP2003026683 ; | [X]WO0033840 (BONNIE DAVIS [US]) [X] 4-11 * page 3, line 20 * * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [X]WO9908672 (SHIRE INTERNATIONAL LICENSING [NL], et al) [X] 4-11 * claims 1,9,12 *; | [X]EP0384676 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [X] 4-11 * claims 1-9 *; | [Y]EP0515301 (SNORRASON ERNIR [IS]) [Y] 1-11 * page 5, line 17 - line 49 * * page 7; compound I * * page 4, line 26 - line 34 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030512), vol. 2003, no. 05, & JP2003026683 A 20030129 (SANKYO CO LTD) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [Y] - ZHANG, LIFEN ET AL, "Cholinergic drugs for Alzheimer 's disease enhance in vitro dopamine release", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY , 66(3), 538-544 CODEN: MOPMA3; ISSN: 0026-895X, (2004), XP002367049 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mol.104.000299 | by applicant | WO0033840 | EP1020470 | JP2003026683 | WO9908672 | EP0384676 | EP0515301 | - ZHANG ET AL., MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (2004), vol. 66, no. 3, pages 538 - 544 | - MANNENS ET AL., DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, (2002), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 553 - 563 | - SCHRATTENHOLZ A ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL, (1996), vol. 49, pages 1 - 6 | - SAMOCHOCKI M ET AL., ACTA NEURO SCAND, (2000), vol. 176, pages 68 - 73 | - SAMOCHOCKI M ET AL., J PHARMACOL EXP THERAP, (2003), vol. 305, pages 1024 - 1036 | - ELLMAN ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1961), vol. 7, page 88 | - KIHARA T ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2004), vol. 325, pages 976 - 982 | - ARIAS E ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 46, pages 103 - IS 14 | - CAPSONI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 12432 - 12437 |