EP1789925 - DEVICE, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR DETERMINING AN ITEM OF INFORMATION CONCERNING A SHAPE AND/OR A POSITION OF AN ELLIPSE IN A GRAPHICAL IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität Ilmenau Ehrenbergstrasse 29 98693 Ilmenau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Technische Universität Ilmenau Ehrenbergstrasse 29 98693 Ilmenau / DE | |||
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Technische Universität Ilmenau Ehrenbergstrasse 29 98693 Ilmenau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEFENZ, Frank Rheinvorlandstrasse 10 68159 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
KATZMANN, Johannes Deubach 27 e 99848 Watha-Farnroda / DE | 03 /
HOLLAND-NELL, Christian Obereller 7 98587 Steinbach-Hallenberg / DE | 04 /
HUSAR, Peter Trieselsrand 10 b 98693 Ilmenau / DE | [2008/34] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
KLEFENZ, Frank Rheinvorlandstrasse 10 68159 Mannheim / DE | ||
02 /
KATZMANN, Johannes Deubach 27 e 99848 Watha-Farnroda / DE | |||
03 /
HOLLAND-NELL, Christian Obereller 7 98587 Steinbach-Hallenberg / DE | |||
04 /
HUSAR, Peter Kaiserstrasse 21 66424 Homburg / DE | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792286.4 | 27.09.2006 | [2007/22] | WO2006EP09387 | Priority number, date | DE20051047160 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005047160 | [2007/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039202 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1789925 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1789925 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/60 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
G06T7/64 (EP,US);
G06V10/48 (EP,US);
G06V40/193 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUM ERMITTELN EINER INFORMATION ÜBER EINE FORM UND/ODER EINE LAGE EINER ELLIPSE IN EINEM GRAPHISCHEN BILD | [2007/22] | English: | DEVICE, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR DETERMINING AN ITEM OF INFORMATION CONCERNING A SHAPE AND/OR A POSITION OF AN ELLIPSE IN A GRAPHICAL IMAGE | [2007/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR DETERMINER DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES A LA FORME ET/OU A L'EMPLACEMENT D'UNE ELLIPSE DANS UNE IMAGE GRAPHIQUE | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 14.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.02.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IE | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | LT | 13.02.2008 | LV | 13.02.2008 | PL | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | IS | 13.06.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | AT | 27.09.2008 | LU | 27.09.2008 | BE | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2011/05] |
Former [2010/42] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
AT | 27.09.2008 | ||
LU | 27.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
AT | 27.09.2008 | ||
LU | 27.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
AT | 27.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE19750835 (KLEFENZ FRANK DR [DE]) [DA] 1-35 * abstract * * column 6, line 25 - column 10, line 18 *; | [A] - GONEID A ET AL, "A method for the Hough transform detection of circles and ellipses using a 1-dimensional array", SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, 1997. COMPUTATIONAL CYBERNETICS AND SIMULATION., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 12-15 OCT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971012), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-4053-1, pages 3154 - 3157, XP010249080 [A] 1-35 * abstract * * Abschnitt 2.1 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.1997.633079 | [A] - HO C ET AL, "A fast ellipse/circle detector using geometric symmetry", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, KIDLINGTON, GB, (199501), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 117 - 124, XP004014038 [A] 1-35 * abstract * * Abschnitte 2.1, 2.2 * * figures 1,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(94)00077-Y | [A] - WONG A K C ET AL, "Robotic vision: 3D object recognition and pose determination", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, 1998. PROCEEDINGS., 1998 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VICTORIA, BC, CANADA 13-17 OCT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19981013), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-4465-0, pages 1202 - 1209, XP010311553 [A] 1-35 * Abschnitte 1.2, 2 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.1998.727463 | [A] - KLEFENZ F., OBERLE M., MÄNNER R., "VLSI Implementierung eines parallelen Hough-Transformations-Prozessors mit dynamisch nachladbaren Mustern", REIHE INFORMATIK, (1995), vol. 22/95, XP002415048 [A] 1-35 * the whole document * |