EP1957860 - LUMINAIRE HAVING CLOSURE ELEMENTS BETWEEN A TROUGH-SHAPED HOUSING AND A COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Schweizerstrasse 30 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADNER, Wolfgang Leiblachstrasse 13a A-6912 Hörbranz / AT | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792418.3 | 11.10.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006EP09824 | Priority number, date | DE20051058959 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005058959 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007065497 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957860 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1957860 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F21V17/16 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
F21V17/164 (EP,KR,US);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTE MIT VERSCHLUSSELEMENTEN ZWISCHEN EINEM WANNENFÖRMIGEN GEHÄUSE UND EINER ABDECKUNG | [2008/34] | English: | LUMINAIRE HAVING CLOSURE ELEMENTS BETWEEN A TROUGH-SHAPED HOUSING AND A COVER | [2008/34] | French: | LUMINAIRE POURVU D'ELEMENTS DE FERMETURE ENTRE UN BOITIER EN FORME DE CUVETTE ET UN COUVERCLE | [2010/24] |
Former [2008/34] | LUMINAIRE POURVU D ÉLÉMENTS DE FERMETURE ENTRE UN BOÎTIER EN FORME DE CUVETTE ET UN COUVERCLE | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09177016.4 / EP2151624 | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | IE | 15.12.2010 | IT | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | NL | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 15.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0947766 (SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] * * column 7, line 44 - line 56 * * paragraph [0036] ** figures 1-8 * | by applicant | EP0785391 |