EP1875212 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING CHARACTERISTICS OF THE SURFACE OF A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PlasmaTreat GmbH Bisamweg 10 33803 Steinhagen / DE | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSKE, Christian Meschers Hof 14 33803 Steinhagen / DE | 02 /
KNOSPE, Alexander Zur grossen Wiese 12 31848 Bad Münster / DE | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792456.3 | 21.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006EP61749 | Priority number, date | DE20051018926 | 22.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005018926 | [2008/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136467 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1875212 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/73 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
G01N21/73 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/31] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINER OBERFLÄCHE EINES WERKSTÜCKES | [2008/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING CHARACTERISTICS OF THE SURFACE OF A WORKPIECE | [2008/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CARACTERISER UNE SURFACE D'UNE PIECE A USINER | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.07.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 24.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0761415 (AGRODYN HOCHSPANNUNGSTECHNIK G [DE]) [DY] 1-10,20 * column 1, line 6 - line 13 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 53 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]DE3344683 (GUSTAV STAEHLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 11-19 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * [Y] 1-10,20; | [PX]DE102004004666 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4,7,9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * | Examination | EP1410852 | DE19635046 | DE2513266 | EP0761415 | DE3344683 | by applicant | EP0761415 | EP1410852 | EP1335641 | WO9952333 | WO0143512 | WO0132949 | DE3344683 | DE19635046 |