EP1907195 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ONE- OR MULTI-LAYER FIBRE PREFORMS WITH A TFP METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/15] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING IN A TFP METHOD ONE-OR MULTI-LAYER LAYER FIBRE PREFORMS AND A SUPPORT LAYER | ||
[2008/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÖRN, Paul Holstenwiete 9g 22763 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
EBERTH, Ulrich Bayernstrasse 3 86641 Rain / DE | [2008/20] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
JÖRN, Paul Holstenwiete 9g 22763 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
EBERTH, Ulrich Carl-Goerdeler-Weg 3 21684 Stade / DE | Representative(s) | Peckmann, Ralf ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Peckmann, Ralf Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Peckmann, Ralf Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792549.5 | 24.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006EP64569 | Priority number, date | DE20051034395 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005034395 | [2008/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010049 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1907195 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907195 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/54, B29B11/16, D04H13/00, B29C70/48, B29K105/10 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
B29B11/16 (EP,US);
B29C70/20 (EP,US);
B29C70/543 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/322 (EP,US);
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
B32B5/12 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
B29C37/0075 (EP,US);
B29C70/342 (EP,US);
B29C70/48 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0097 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0215 (EP,US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/34] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EIN-ODER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN FASERVORFORMLINGEN IM TFP-VERFAHREN | [2008/45] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ONE- OR MULTI-LAYER FIBRE PREFORMS WITH A TFP METHOD | [2008/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'EBAUCHES FIBREUSES MONOCOUCHES OU MULTICOUCHES SELON LE PROCEDE TFP | [2008/45] |
Former [2008/15] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EIN- ODER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN FASERVORFORMLINGEN IM TFP-VERFAHREN SOWIE TRAGSCHICHT | ||
Former [2008/15] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING IN A TFP METHOD ONE-OR MULTI-LAYER LAYER FIBRE PREFORMS AND A SUPPORT LAYER | ||
Former [2008/15] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'EBAUCHES DE FIBRES MONOCOUCHES OU MULTICOUCHES SELON LE PROCEDE TFP ET COUCHE SUPPORT | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 23.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE19629044 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 7 * column 6, line 19 - line 67; figure 4 * * column 7, line 34 - line 63; figure 7 * [A] 1-6; | [DA]WO0245932 (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-7 * page 7, line 29 - page 9, line 18; figures 1-4 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 2 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Erläuterung zur TFP-Technologie", INTERNET CITATION, (20050307), URL: http://www.hightex-dresden.de/tfptech.pdf, (20060927), XP002400709 [A] 1-7 * page 2, paragraph 1.3 - page 4, paragraph 1.6 * |