EP1948374 - PERMANENT CASTING MOULD AND CASTING MOULD INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nemak Linz GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 24 4030 Linz / AT | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Hydro Aluminium Mandl&Berger GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 24 4030 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSCH, Rolf, Dr. Amselweg 5 A-4600 Wels / AT | 02 /
STIKA, Peter, Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 23 A-4030 Linz / AT | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
GOSCH, Rolf, Dr. Amselweg 5 A-4600 Wels / AT | ||
02 /
STIKA, Peter, Dr. Zepplinstrasse 23 A-4030 Linz / AT | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792722.8 | 07.08.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006EP65098 | Priority number, date | DE20051054616 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005054616 | [2008/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007057238 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948374 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1948374 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/06, B22D17/22 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
B22C9/061 (EP,US);
B22C9/06 (KR);
B22C19/00 (KR);
B22D17/229 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAUERGIESSFORM UND GIESSFORMEINSATZ | [2008/31] | English: | PERMANENT CASTING MOULD AND CASTING MOULD INSERT | [2008/31] | French: | MOULE PERMANENT ET PIECE DE COULEE INSEREE | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | IE | 07.08.2013 | LU | 07.08.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | BE | 31.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/33] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
PT | 26.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10059045 (HASCO HASENCLEVER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE4313336 (BIELER HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19838561 | DE10059045 | DE4313336 |