EP1931534 - TRANSMISSION DRIVE UNIT COMPRISING A RECEIVING MODULE, ESPECIALLY FOR ADJUSTING A MOBILE PART IN THE MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBERLE, Hans-Juergen Badstr. 4 76437 Raststatt / DE | 02 /
LIENIG, Andreas Honaustr. 27c 77815 Buehl / DE | [2008/25] | Application number, filing date | 06792813.5 | 14.08.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006EP65292 | Priority number, date | DE20051046356 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005046356 | [2008/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007036389 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1931534 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1931534 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/44, B60N2/02, F16H25/20 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
F16H25/20 (EP,KR,US);
B60N2/0224 (EP,KR,US);
B60N2/02253 (EP,US);
B60N2/929 (EP,US);
F16H2025/2037 (EP,US);
F16H2025/2084 (EP,US);
F16H2025/209 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18576 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18664 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, HU, IT [2008/43] |
Former [2008/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBE-ANTRIEBSEINHEIT MIT EINEM AUFNAHMEMODUL, INSBESONDERE ZUM VERSTELLEN EINES BEWEGLICHEN TEILS IM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2008/25] | English: | TRANSMISSION DRIVE UNIT COMPRISING A RECEIVING MODULE, ESPECIALLY FOR ADJUSTING A MOBILE PART IN THE MOTOR VEHICLE | [2008/25] | French: | UNITE DE TRANSMISSION ET D'ENTRAINEMENT MUNIE D'UN MODULE DE RECEPTION, SERVANT NOTAMMENT A DEPLACER UNE PARTIE MOBILE D'AUTOMOBILE | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 29.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.11.2009 | ES | 22.02.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | [2012/42] |
Former [2011/18] | IT | 11.11.2009 | |
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 22.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4101470 ; | [DA]EP0759374 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP1223073 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]WO2004028305 (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE], et al); | [PX]WO2006024598 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) |