EP1938451 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AMPLIFYING PULSED RF SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES 45 Rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LETEMPLIER, Alain 9, Résidence du Rocher F-53100 Mayenne / FR | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Dudouit, Isabelle Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dudouit, Isabelle Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/27] | Dudouit, Isabelle MARKS & CLERK France Conseil en Propriété Industrielle 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06793081.8 | 30.08.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006EP65837 | Priority number, date | FR20050008876 | 30.08.2005 Original published format: FR 0508876 | [2008/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007025995 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938451 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02, H03F3/193 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
H03F3/72 (EP,US);
H03F1/025 (EP,US);
H03F3/189 (EP,US);
H03F3/1935 (EP,US);
H03F2200/451 (EP,US);
H03F2200/504 (EP,US);
H03F2200/507 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG GEPULSTER HF-SIGNALE | [2008/27] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AMPLIFYING PULSED RF SIGNALS | [2008/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR AMPLIFIER DES SIGNAUX RF IMPULSIONNELS | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2020 | 20.05.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/41] | 30.05.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/41] | 17.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5155492 (HOPWOOD FRANCIS W [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 34 - column 7, line 17; figure 3 *; | [X]US6107880 (SHAW MICHAEL JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 14; figure 2 *; | [A]US5892403 (BRANDT PER-OLOF [SE]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 41 - column 7, line 36; figures 3-5 * | Examination | JP2003243948 | EP1538743 | JPH02268008 | by applicant | US6573796 | US5155492 |