|
05.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.07.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |