EP1934728 - CONFIGURATION OF REMOTE DATA PROCESSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYES, Eduardo, Lazaro 2601 Scofield Ridge Parkway Apt 723 Austin, Texas 78727 / US | 02 /
VALLABHANENI, Vasu 9103 Topridge Drive Austin, Texas 78750 / US | 03 /
VO, Patrick, Tam 12075 Plum Point Road Houston, Texas 77099 / US | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Field, Howard John, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Field, Howard John, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 06793279.8 | 06.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006EP66078 | Priority number, date | US20050232762 | 22.09.2005 Original published format: US 232762 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039386 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1934728 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
G06F8/60 (EP,US);
G06F9/44505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | KONFIGURATION VON FERNDATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2008/26] | English: | CONFIGURATION OF REMOTE DATA PROCESSING SYSTEMS | [2008/26] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE SYSTEMES DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES A DISTANCE | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 11.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2008 | 30.09.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5894571 (O'CONNOR CLINT H [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]EP1376341 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 40 - line 47 * * page 3, line 21 - page 8, line 47 * * page 21, line 48 - page 23, line 49 * * claims 1,9,13,19,25,28,31,33,34,37,38,52 * * figures 2-6,9-11 *; | [A]US2004268340 (STEEB CURT A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 1, column R, line 33 - page 7, column L, line 26 * * page 79, column L, line 1 - page 80, column R, line 6 * * figures 1-3,5a-f,11 *; | [A] - INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, "Method for hardware console surveillance in a pSeries eServer", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (200107), vol. 447, no. 161, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007128662 [A] 1,6,9,10,12 * the whole document * |