EP1927257 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING MULTIPLE GROUP SERVICES IN A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/23] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A GROUP SERVICE IN A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | ||
[2010/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERZOG, Christian Esplanade 24 b 13187 Berlin / DE | 02 /
LÜDE, Thomas Altmarkstr. 3 A 12169 Berlin / DE | [2008/23] | Application number, filing date | 06793378.8 | 08.09.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006EP66196 | Priority number, date | DE20051044857 | 13.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005044857 | [2008/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007031474 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927257 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927257 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP,BR,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,BR,US);
H04M15/57 (EP,BR,US);
H04M15/8066 (EP,BR,US);
H04M15/8072 (EP,BR,US);
H04M15/8077 (EP,BR,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,BR,US);
H04M2215/2073 (EP,BR,US);
H04M2215/208 (EP,BR,US);
H04M2215/2093 (EP,BR,US);
H04M2215/7478 (EP,BR,US);
H04M2215/7485 (EP,BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/23] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM BETREIBEN MEHRERER GRUPPENDIENSTE IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2010/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING MULTIPLE GROUP SERVICES IN A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2010/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER PLUSIEURS SERVICES DE GROUPE DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2010/18] |
Former [2008/23] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES GRUPPENDIENSTES IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | ||
Former [2008/23] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A GROUP SERVICE IN A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | ||
Former [2008/23] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SERVICE DE GROUPE DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.09.2010 | CZ | 01.09.2010 | DK | 01.09.2010 | EE | 01.09.2010 | FI | 01.09.2010 | IE | 01.09.2010 | LT | 01.09.2010 | LV | 01.09.2010 | NL | 01.09.2010 | PL | 01.09.2010 | RO | 01.09.2010 | SE | 01.09.2010 | SI | 01.09.2010 | SK | 01.09.2010 | LU | 08.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | FR | 02.11.2010 | BG | 01.12.2010 | GB | 01.12.2010 | GR | 02.12.2010 | ES | 12.12.2010 | IS | 01.01.2011 | PT | 03.01.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/44] | BG | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
LU | 08.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
HU | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
HU | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | LT | 01.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2004114643 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-4,10-12,14,15 * page 1, line 6 - line 20 * * page 3, line 21 - line 34 * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 1 * * page 10, line 1 - line 18 * * page 13, line 22 - page 14, line 10 * [I] 5,6,13,16-18,22-24; | [XI]WO2005051007 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1,2,7,12,14,15,19,24 * page 1, line 4 - line 7 * * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 8 * * page 5, line 15 - line 19 * * page 21, line 1 - line 22 * * page 22, line 20 - line 27 * * page 23, line 11 - line 27 * * page 24, line 17 - line 19 * * page 25, line 31 - page 26, line 12 * [I] 8,9,20,21; | [XI]US2005190740 (ZHAO WEN [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,10-12,14,15,22-24 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * [I] 5,6,13,16-18; | [X] - KIM P ET AL, "IMS-based push-to-talk over GPRS/UMTS", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2005 IEEE NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 13-17 MARCH 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050313), ISBN 0-7803-8966-2, pages 2472 - 2477, XP010791564 [X] 1,14 * page 2472, column L, line 11 - line 43 * * page 2473, column L, line 1 - line 44 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.2005.1424902 |