EP1910666 - SAFE START-UP INTERFACE FOR A VEHICLE WITH AN ELECTRIC STARTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ariance 42 rue Ordener 75018 Paris / FR | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZARNYSZKA, Thierry 42 rue Ordener 75018 Paris / FR | 02 /
PARENT, Eric 14 rue de la Libération 92210 Saint Cloud / FR | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie, et al Cabinet Moutard 35 Rue de la Paroisse B.P. 20513 78005 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie, et al Cabinet Moutard 35 Rue de la Paroisse B.P. 20513 78005 Versailles Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/16] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie, et al Cabinet Moutard, 35, rue de la Paroisse 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 06794175.7 | 11.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006FR01716 | Priority number, date | FR20050007436 | 12.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0507436 | [2008/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007006981 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910666 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/12, H02J7/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
F02N11/12 (EP,US);
H02J1/122 (EP,US);
H02J7/00304 (EP,US);
H02J7/00308 (EP);
H02J7/0034 (EP,US);
F02N11/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERE STARTSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG MIT EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN STARTER | [2008/17] | English: | SAFE START-UP INTERFACE FOR A VEHICLE WITH AN ELECTRIC STARTER | [2008/16] | French: | INTERFACE SECURISEE DE DEMARRAGE POUR ENGIN A DEMARREUR ELECTRIQUE | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/16] | SICHERE STARTSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUGMIT EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN STARTER | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5230637 (WEBER WILLIAM P [US]) [X] 1-15 * figure 5 *; | [X]US6262492 (SHENG SHYAN-FANG [TW]) [X] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]US2005110467 (THOMASON LINCOLN [US]) [A] 9,10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]US2005040788 (TSENG WEN ING [TW]) [A] 12,14,15 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP1396919 (LIU STEVE [TW], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]US4769586 (KAZMIEROWICZ THADDEUS V [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2002155752 (WINKLE STUART TREVOR [NZ], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure - * |