Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009039712 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006FR01716 | 11.07.2006 | FR0507436 | 12.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1910666 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006FR01716 | 11.07.2006 | FR0507436 | 12.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2615044 | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006FR01716 | 11.07.2006 | FR0507436 | 12.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007006981 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0507436 | 12.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2888620 | 12.10.2007 | B1 | FR2888620 | 19.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0507436 | 12.07.2005 |