EP1908048 - DEVICE FOR DRIVING MOBILE PRISMATIC MEMBERS FOR ADVERTISING BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mecatec Rue de Bicentenaire 01120 Dagneux / FR | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARGE, Gerard 3 rue des Peupliers F-01000 Oyonnax / FR | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, John Roosevelt Consultants 139 rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Schmitt, John Roosevelt Consultants, 109, rue Sully, BP 6138 69466 Lyon Cédex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06794216.9 | 26.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006FR01817 | Priority number, date | FR20050007973 | 26.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0507973 | [2008/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007012752 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908048 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908048 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/02 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
G09F11/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG MOBILER PRISMENELEMENTE FÜR REKLAMETAFELN | [2008/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR DRIVING MOBILE PRISMATIC MEMBERS FOR ADVERTISING BOARDS | [2008/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT D'ORGANES MOBILES PRISMATIQUES POUR PANNEAUX PUBLICITAIRES | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 08.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | IE | 31.12.2008 | LT | 31.12.2008 | LV | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | PL | 31.12.2008 | RO | 31.12.2008 | SI | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | IS | 30.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | HU | 01.07.2009 | LU | 26.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
LU | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
LU | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB436675 (SIEMENS BROTHERS & CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 20 - line 32 ** figure 2 *; | [AD]EP0539308 (MECATEC SARL DE NATIONALITE FR [FR]) [AD] 1-7 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 40 * * claim 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0770980 (ASSEMBLA LICHTREKLAME B V [NL]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 11 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US6178675 (STROTHER LOUIS L [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 14 - line 36 * * figures 1,11 * |