EP1942763 - FABRIC ARTICLE WITH FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/29] | FASTENER | ||
[2015/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Squid Inc. Rue Charles Bonnet, 6 1206 Geneva / CH | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIERCE, Jones David Rue Charles Bonnet, 6 CH-1206 Geneva / CH | 02 /
GILBERTSON, Michael Quinton Flat 12, 21 De Vere Gardens Kensington London W8 5AN / GB | [2016/01] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
PIERCE, Jones David Rue Charles Bonnet, 6 CH-1206 Geneva / CH | ||
02 /
GILBERTSON, Michael Quinton Flat 12, 21 De Vere Gardens Kensington London W8 5AN / GB | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Pluckrose, Anthony William Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Pluckrose, Anthony William Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06794628.5 | 03.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006GB03676 | Priority number, date | GB20050020488 | 07.10.2005 Original published format: GB 0520488 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007042762 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942763 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1942763 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A44B17/00 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
A44B17/0058 (EP,GB,US);
A44B17/0082 (GB);
Y10T24/3683 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEXTILARTIKEL MIT BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT | [2015/15] | English: | FABRIC ARTICLE WITH FASTENER | [2015/15] | French: | ARTICLE TEXTILE AVEC ATTACHE | [2015/15] |
Former [2008/29] | BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT | ||
Former [2008/29] | FASTENER | ||
Former [2008/29] | ATTACHE | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.11.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2011 | 31.10.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2006 | AT | 30.12.2015 | BE | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | IT | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.10.2006 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.10.2006 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2202854 (HARTNETT JOHN F); | [XY]JPH09228114 (TANAKA MASAMI); | [XY]GB2333802 (YKK CORP [JP]); | [XY]JP2001161408 (AAKUTEKKU KK); | [XY]US6260240 (AKASHI SHUNJI [JP], et al); | [XY]JP2004121364 (MORITO CO LTD, et al); | [XY]FR2853499 (WELL DONE CONCEPTS S A S [FR]); | [XY]JP2005074033 (YOSHIDA KIICHI) |