EP1937474 - LAMINATED GLAZING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pilkington Group Limited European Technical Centre Hall Lane, Lathom Nr. Ormskirk Lancashire L40 5UF / GB | [2016/29] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Pilkington Group Limited Prescot Road St. Helens Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIXON, Jonathan, Barclay 4, Burnside Parbold Lancashire WN8 7PD / GB | 02 /
GREENALL, Michael, Robert 12 Windflower Drive Clayton-le-Woods Lancashire PR25 5RG / GB | [2016/32] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
DIXON, Jonathan, Barclay 4, Burnside Parbold Lancashire WN8 7PD / GB | ||
02 /
GREENALL, Michael, Robert 12 Windflower Drive Clayton-le-Woods Lancashire PR25 5RG / GB | Representative(s) | Pettet, Nicholas Edward, et al Pilkington Group Limited Intellectual Property Pilkington European Technical Centre Hall Lane, Lathom Ormskirk, Lancashire L40 5UF / GB | [2016/32] |
Former [2009/14] | Pettet, Nicholas Edward, et al Pilkington Group Limited Intellectual Property Pilkington European Technical Centre Hall Lane Lathom Ormskirk, Lancashire L40 5UF / GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Pilkington Group Limited Group IP Department Pilkington Europ. Technical Centre Hall Lane, Lathom Ormskirk, Lancashire L40 5UF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06794668.1 | 05.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006GB03717 | Priority number, date | GB20050020303 | 06.10.2005 Original published format: GB 0520303 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039751 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1937474 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937474 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, B32B15/08, H05B3/84, H05K3/06, H01Q1/12, B60S1/08, G08B13/04, G01N27/04 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/09 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B60S1/0822 (EP,US);
B60S1/0877 (EP,US);
H01Q1/1271 (EP,US);
H05B3/86 (EP,US);
B32B2311/04 (US);
B32B2311/08 (US);
B32B2311/12 (US);
B32B2311/24 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2605/006 (US);
B60S1/0825 (EP,US);
B60S1/0874 (EP,US);
G01N27/22 (EP,US);
H05B2203/016 (EP,US);
H05B2203/017 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31627 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3163 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B32B17/10005, B32B2367/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAMINIERTE VERGLASUNG | [2008/27] | English: | LAMINATED GLAZING | [2008/27] | French: | VITRAGE STRATIFIE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 24.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2006 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | IE | 05.10.2016 | LU | 05.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.10.2006 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [IX]US2982934 (BROWNE CHARLES M) [I] 1,3,5,6,12 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 24 * [X] 13; | [A]US3893234 (LEVIN BERTON P) [A] 1-3,5-7,9-11,13-15 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 64 *; | [A]US4806432 (EGUCHI YOSHITUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,10,12-14 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 9; examples 1,2 *; | [A]EP0717459 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-7,9,10,12-15 * page 2, column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 52; figure 1; claims 1,3,5,6 *; | [DA]WO2004110747 (PILKINGTON ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [DA] 8,16* claim - *; | [X]US2005023264 (BARTRUG BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,12,13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0012] , [0013] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0031]; figures 2-4 * |