EP1891219 - TETRACYCLINE-DEPENDENT REGULATION OF RNA INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Université Pierre et Marie Curie (Paris 6) 4, Place Jussieu 75252 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE PIERRE ET MARIE CURIE (PARIS VI) 4, place Jussieu 75252 Paris Cédex 05 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLET, Jacques 18, rue Charcot F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
VOGEL, Roland 13, Square Ronsard F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 03 /
AMAR, Lahouari 27, rue Emile Zola F-94800 Villejuif / FR | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Chajmowicz, Marion, et al Becker & Associés 25, Rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Chajmowicz, Marion, et al Cabinet BECKER & Associés 25 rue Louis Legrand 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06795330.7 | 31.05.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006IB02315 | Priority number, date | US20050685483P | 31.05.2005 Original published format: US 685483 P | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007004062 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1891219 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63, C12N15/11 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/635 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2320/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TETRACYCLIN-ABHÄNGIGE REGULATION VON RNA-INTERFERENZEN | [2008/09] | English: | TETRACYCLINE-DEPENDENT REGULATION OF RNA INTERFERENCE | [2008/09] | French: | REGULATION DEPENDANTE DE LA TETRACYCLINE DE L'ARN INTERFERENT | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2005007877 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-27 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4; | [X]WO2004048583 (INST CLAYTON DE LA RECH [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-27 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004035782 (ARTEMIS PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7-27 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005073380 (COLD SPRING HARBOR LAB [US], et al) [PX] 1-27 * page 17, line 27 - page 18, line 13; example 1; claim 24 *; | [YD] - GUPTA S ET AL, "Inducible, reversible, and stable RNA interference in mammalian cells", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20040217), vol. 101, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1927 - 1932, XP002340765 [YD] 3,4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0306111101 | [A] - SALUCCI V ET AL, "Tight control of gene expression by a helper-dependent adenovirus vector carying the rtTA2S-M2 tetracycline transactivator and repressor system", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB, (2002), vol. 9, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 1415 - 1421, XP002320614 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301813 | [AD] - DANZEISER D A ET AL, "FUNCTIONAL CHARACTERIZATION OF ELEMENTS IN HUMAN U6 SMALL NUCLEAR RNA GENE DISTAL CONTROL REGION", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US, (199308), vol. 13, no. 8, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 4670 - 4678, XP001038012 | [AD] - CZAUDERNA F ET AL, "Inducible shRNA expression for application in a prostate cancer mouse model", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20031101), vol. 31, no. 21, ISSN 0305-1048, page e127, XP002290539 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gng127 | [PX] - AMAR LAHOUARI ET AL, "Control of small inhibitory RNA levels and RNA interference by doxycycline induced activation of a minimal RNA polymerase III promoter.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH 2006, (2006), vol. 34, no. 5, ISSN 1362-4962, page e37, XP002419186 [PX] 1-23 * the whole document * |