EP2018206 - MEDICAL-USE BANDAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kroener-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2011/50] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB no. 16, Magistratsvagen 22010 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMBOURGI, Christina No. 206, Grande Rue Oullins 69600 / FR | 02 /
BERNARD, Pascal No. 78, Chemin Du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | 03 /
GOBY, Jean Michel No. 5, Impasse Du Sans Souci 21800 Sennecey Les Dijon / FR | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Ponzellini, Gianmarco, et al Gambro Legal and Intellectual Property Dept. P.O. Box 98 41037 Mirandola / IT | ||
Former [2009/05] | Guéry-Jacques, Géraldine Gambro Legal & Intellectual Property Dept. P.O. Box 98 41037 Mirandola / IT | Application number, filing date | 06795378.6 | 30.08.2006 | [2009/05] | WO2006IB02375 | Priority number, date | FR20060004221 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: FR 0604221 | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132288 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2018206 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2018206 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/02 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
A61M25/02 (EP,US);
A61F13/00 (KR);
A61F13/02 (KR);
A61F15/00 (KR);
A61M2025/0246 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0266 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0273 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBAND ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN ANWENDUNG | [2009/05] | English: | MEDICAL-USE BANDAGE | [2009/05] | French: | BANDAGE A USAGE MEDICAL | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 19.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 20.10.2008 | [2012/10] |
Former [2009/25] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 04.05.2009 | ||
[2012/10] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2006 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.08.2006 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6267115 (MARSHEL FLORINE [US]) [X] 1,13-17,22 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 45; figure - *; | [X]WO9721459 (NIKOMED APS [DK], et al) [X] 1,13-18,22 * page 16, line 37 - page 19, line 20; figure - *; | [A]US5885254 (MATYAS MELANIE E [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [DA]WO9300788 (NIKOMED APS [DK]) [DA] 1-3 * abstract * |