EP1893788 - POLYMER ARTICLE HAVING A THIN COATING FORMED ON AT LEAST ONE OF ITS SIDE BY PLASMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/10] | POLYMER ARTICLE HAVING A THIN COATING FORMED ON AT LEAST ONE OF ITS SIDE BY PLASMA AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTING SUCH ARTICLE | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Systems & Technologies 9, rue Fulgence Bienvenue 22300 Lannion / FR | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELDI, Nasser Résidence Kergomar Bâtiment 23 F-22300 Lannion / FR | 02 /
CHOLLET, Patrick 5, impasse du Penker Servel F-22300 Lannion / FR | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/10] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06795456.0 | 16.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006IB02483 | Priority number, date | WO2005FR07063 | 16.06.2005 Original published format: PCT/FR2005/007063 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007072120 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893788 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893788 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/04 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C23C16/0245 (EP,US);
C08J7/065 (KR);
B65D25/14 (US);
B32B27/28 (KR);
B32B27/32 (KR);
C08J7/123 (KR);
C08J7/18 (KR);
C23C16/30 (EP,US);
C23C16/505 (EP,US);
C23C16/54 (EP,US);
C23C28/04 (EP,US);
B32B2439/70 (KR);
C08J2323/06 (KR);
C08J2323/12 (KR);
C08J2483/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | C23C30/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | HR | 23.11.2007 | Title | German: | POLYMERGEGENSTAND MIT EINER DÜNNEN, AUS PLASMA GEBILDETEN BESCHICHTUNG AUF MINDESTENS EINER SEITE | [2014/45] | English: | POLYMER ARTICLE HAVING A THIN COATING FORMED ON AT LEAST ONE OF ITS SIDE BY PLASMA | [2014/45] | French: | ARTICLE EN POLYMÈRE AYANT UN REVÊTEMENT MINCE FORMÉ SUR AU MOINS L'UN DE SES CÔTÉS PAR PLASMA | [2014/45] |
Former [2008/10] | POLYMERGEGENSTAND MIT EINER DÜNNEN, AUS PLASMA GEBILDETEN BESCHICHTUNG AUF MINDESTENS EINER SEITE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN GEGENSTANDS | ||
Former [2008/10] | POLYMER ARTICLE HAVING A THIN COATING FORMED ON AT LEAST ONE OF ITS SIDE BY PLASMA AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTING SUCH ARTICLE | ||
Former [2008/10] | ARTICLE EN POLYMÈRE AYANT UN REVÊTEMENT MINCE FORMÉ SUR AU MOINS L'UN DE SES CÔTÉS PAR PLASMA ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À PRODUIRE UN TEL ARTICLE | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13155752.2 / EP2597175 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2008 | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | FI | 24.12.2014 | LT | 24.12.2014 | LV | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | IS | 24.04.2015 | LU | 16.06.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/11] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 24.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US2003215652 (O'CONNOR PAUL J [US]) [DX] 2-8 * page 1, paragraph 10 - paragraph 12; examples 2,8b,10; claims 1-5,12 * * page 2, paragraphs 16,19-21 *; | [X]WO2004044039 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 2-7 * page 8; claims 1-4 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 13 *; | [A]JPH0732531 (KUWABARA YASUNAGA) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - TESHIMA K ET AL, "Growth and structure of silica films deposited on a polymeric material by plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition", PREPARATION AND CHARACTERIZATION, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, NL, (20021202), vol. 420-421, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 324 - 329, XP004397866 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(02)00847-7 |