EP1929144 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITANI, Shinichi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
SAWADA, Daisaku c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2012/29] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
MITANI, Shinichi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
SAWADA, Daisaku c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06795464.4 | 12.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006IB02496 | Priority number, date | JP20050264226 | 12.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005264226 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007031839 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1929144 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929144 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02B43/10, F02D19/02, F02B47/10 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
F02B23/101 (EP,US);
F02B43/12 (EP,US);
F02D19/024 (EP,US);
F02D35/023 (EP,US);
F02D41/0027 (EP,US);
F02M21/0206 (EP,US);
F02M25/00 (EP,US);
F02D19/027 (EP,US);
F02D2041/147 (EP,US);
F02D2250/18 (EP,US);
F02D41/1498 (EP,US);
F02M21/0245 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/40] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/24] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2008/24] | French: | MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 15.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09005943.7 / EP2078838 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4141326 (WOLBER WILLIAM G) [A] 1,2,12,13,15,16 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0211826 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) [A] 1,2,12,13,15,16 * abstract *; | [A]US6405720 (COLLIER JR R KIRK [US]) [A] 4,14,17 * column 7, line 25 - line 42 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US6651623 (TANG XIAOGUO [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12,13,15,16 * column 1, line 5 - line 11 * * column 3, line 55 - line 56 * * column 5, line 51 - line 54 *; | [PA]WO2006013870 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 4,14,17 * page 2, line 11 - line 22 * * page 3, paragraph 3 ** page 13, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 1 * |