EP1922875 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING POWER STATES IN A MULTIMEDIA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERGOOSSEN, Theodorus, A., P., G. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DRIESEN, Bas c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/21] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06795702.7 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006IB52866 | Priority number, date | EP20050107729 | 23.08.2005 Original published format: EP 05107729 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007023437 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1922875 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N21/43632 (EP,US);
H04N21/44209 (EP,US);
H04N21/4424 (EP,US);
H04N21/44245 (EP,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
H04N21/4436 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON LEISTUNGSZUSTÄNDEN IN EINEM MULTIMEDIASYSTEM | [2008/21] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING POWER STATES IN A MULTIMEDIA SYSTEM | [2008/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DES ETATS D'ALIMENTATION DANS UN SYSTEME MULTIMEDIA | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2016 | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/10] | 16.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 18.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0219078 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 29 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US6593975 (OH IN-HEUNG [KR]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 38 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 31 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 35 ** figures 2,3 *; | [E]US2006209745 (MACMULLAN SAMUEL J [US], et al) [E] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0119] * * figures 16,17 *; | [E]US2006280055 (MILLER RODNEY D [US], et al) [E] 1-24 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0131] * * figures 1-8 * * claims 1-16 *; | [X] - HDMI LICENSING, LLC, "High-Definition Multimedia Interface Specification Version 1.2", (20050522), URL: http://www.hdmi.com/download/HDMI_Specification_1.2.pdf, (20070507), XP002433145 [X] 1-24 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [08.5] - paragraph [08.7] * * paragraph [CEC11] * * paragraphs [CEC13.15] , [CEC14] * |