EP1927043 - METHOD OF MEASURING RELATIVE MOVEMENT IN TWO DIMENSIONS OF AN OBJECT AND AN OPTICAL INPUT DEVICE USING A SINGLE SELF-MIXING LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/43] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUIJVE, Rene Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
STEK, Aalbert Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
HEINKS, Carsten Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
SCHEMMANN, Marcel Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2018/43] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
DUIJVE, Rene Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
STEK, Aalbert Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
HEINKS, Carsten Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
04 /
SCHEMMANN, Marcel Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/43] |
Former [2008/23] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06795759.7 | 23.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006IB52932 | Priority number, date | EP20050107935 | 30.08.2005 Original published format: EP 05107935 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007026286 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1927043 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927043 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0354, G06F3/042 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
G06F3/0421 (EP,US);
G06F3/0354 (KR);
G01S17/87 (EP,US);
G06F3/03 (KR);
G06F3/0346 (US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,US);
G06F3/042 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/23] | G06F3/042 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG MIT EINEM SELBSTMISCHENDEN LASER DER RELATIVBEWEGUNG IN ZWEI DIMENSIONEN ZWISCHEN EIN OBJEKT UND EIN OPTISCHES EINGABEGERÄT | [2018/23] | English: | METHOD OF MEASURING RELATIVE MOVEMENT IN TWO DIMENSIONS OF AN OBJECT AND AN OPTICAL INPUT DEVICE USING A SINGLE SELF-MIXING LASER | [2008/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE D'UN MOUVEMENT RELATIF BIDIMENSIONNEL D'UN OBJET ET D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ENTREE OPTIQUE AU MOYEN D'UN MELANGE LASER SPONTANE | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/23] | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER RELATIVEN BEWEGUNG EINES OBJEKTS UND EINER OPTISCHEN EINGABEVORRICHTUNG IN ZWEI DIMENSIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES EINZELNEN SELBSTMISCHUNGSLASERS | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2018 | 18.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2006 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03102717 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 17, line 24 - page 18, line 23; figures 1a,1b,5-7 *; | [X]WO03098527 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 16, line 12 - page 17, line 7; figures 4a,4b,8-10 *; | [A]WO0237124 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 4-7; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2005076116 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 11, paragraph 2; figures 1a,1b,4a-5 *; | [A]US6301968 (MARUYAMA TETSURO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 2,16 * | [A] - LIESS M ET AL, "A MINIATURIZED MULTIDIRECTIONAL OPTICAL MOTION SENSOR AND INPUT DEVICE BASED ON LASER SELF-MIXING", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (200212), vol. 13, no. 12, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 2001 - 2006, XP001201128 [A] 1-12 * figures 1,3,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/13/12/327 | [A] - HARA K ET AL, "New digital vibrometer with high accuracy using self-mixing type LDV", INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1997. IMTC/97. PROCEEDINGS. SENSING, PROCESSING, NETWORKING., IEEE OTTAWA, ONT., CANADA 19-21 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970519), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-3747-6, pages 860 - 864, XP010233690 [A] 1-12 * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMTC.1997.610210 | Examination | - GUIDO GIULIANI ET AL, "REVIEW ARTICLE; Laser diode self-mixing technique for sensing applications; Laser diode self-mixing technique for sensing applications", JOURNAL OF OPTICS. A, PURE AND APPLIED OPTICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20021101), vol. 4, no. 6, doi:10.1088/1464-4258/4/6/371, ISSN 1464-4258, pages S283 - S294, XP020080988 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1464-4258/4/6/371 |