EP1927045 - ASYNCHRONOUS RIPPLE PIPELINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIELAGE, Paul c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/23] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06795900.7 | 04.09.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006IB53101 | Priority number, date | EP20050108127 | 05.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05108127 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007029168 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1927045 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
G06F7/00 (EP,US);
G06F5/08 (EP,US);
G06F9/3871 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ASYNCHRONE WELLROHRLEITUNG | [2008/23] | English: | ASYNCHRONOUS RIPPLE PIPELINE | [2008/23] | French: | PIPELINE ASYNCHRONE A ONDULATIONS | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 19.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3117307 (WALTER DAVIE JULIAN ALBERT) [X] 1-5,7-12,19 * figure 2 *; | [A]US3727204 (DE KOE O) [A] 1-5,7-12,19* figure 1 *; | [A]EP0644478 (CODEX CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0834802 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-5,7-12,19 * figures 4-6 * |