EP1986750 - Use of an extract of Enanthia Chloranta [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/45] | USE OF PROTOBERBERINES AS AN ACTIVE SUBSTANCE REGULATING THE PILOSEBACEOUS UNIT | ||
[2018/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEDERMA 29, rue du Chemin-Vert Boîte postale 33 78612 Le Perray-en-Yvelines Cédex / FR | [2019/17] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states SEDERMA Industrial Property Department 29, rue du Chemin Vert Boîte Postale 33 78612 Le Perray en Yvelines Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINTNER, Karl 442, allée des Arbousiers F-06500 Menton / FR | 02 /
MAS-CHAMBERLIN, Claire 5 résidence Les Chardonnettes Rue De Dampierre F-78460 Chevreuse / FR | [2015/04] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
LINTNER, Karl 2 rue du Manège F-78120 Rambouillet / FR | ||
02 /
MAS-CHAMBERLIN, Claire 5 résidence Les Chardonnettes Rue De Dampierre F-78460 Chevreuse / FR | Application number, filing date | 06795928.8 | 06.09.2006 | [2008/45] | WO2006IB53136 | Priority number, date | FR20050009100 | 06.09.2005 Original published format: FR 0509100 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007029187 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1986750 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1986750 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61K8/9789, A61K8/36 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/416 (US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP,US);
A61P17/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/45] | A61Q19/00, A61K8/40, A61P17/08, A61P17/10, A61P17/14, A61Q7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Extrakts von Enanthia Chloranta | [2018/51] | English: | Use of an extract of Enanthia Chloranta | [2018/51] | French: | Utilisation d'un extrait d'Enanthia Chloranta | [2018/51] |
Former [2008/45] | VERWENDUNG VON PROTOBERBERINEN ALS WIRKSTOFF ZUR REGULIERUNG DER TALGDRÜSEN | ||
Former [2008/45] | USE OF PROTOBERBERINES AS AN ACTIVE SUBSTANCE REGULATING THE PILOSEBACEOUS UNIT | ||
Former [2008/45] | UTILISATION DE PROTOBERBERINES COMME SUBSTANCE ACTIVE REGULANT L'UNITE PILOSEBACEE | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 15.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 15.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2006 | AT | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | DK | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | ES | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | IT | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | NL | 24.04.2019 | PL | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | SE | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | IE | 06.09.2019 | LU | 06.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.09.2019 | ||
LU | 06.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.09.2019 | ||
LU | 06.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.09.2019 | ||
LU | 06.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
LU | 06.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 24.04.2019 | |
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 24.04.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]KR20030073170 ; | JPH0570360 [ ] (LION CORP); | JPH08113516 [ ] (SHISEIDO CO LTD, et al); | JPH11255651 [ ] (MARUZEN SEIYAKU KK); | [X]WO2004016239 (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-36 * page 5, lines 15-23 * * example - *; | [X]US2005158404 (GOODLESS DEAN R [US]) [X] 1-36 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] - [0017] - [0035] , [0036] , [0045] , [0054] *; | [X] - "Composition for preventing alopecia and promoting hair growth, containing berberine, derivatives thereof or salt", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 08, Database accession no. 2004-078247, XP002432707 & KR20030073170 A 20030919 (JUNG J M) [X] 1-36 * column A * | [X] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (19930323), XP002432698 [X] 1-36 * column A * | [X] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (19990921), XP002432699 [X] 1-36 * column A * | [X] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (19960507), XP002432700 [X] 1-36 * column A * |