EP1930040 - PREFILLED SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [2011/11] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Nipro Corporation 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASA, Masanobu c/o NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 02 /
NANBA, Ryohei c/o NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 03 /
HASEGAWA, Mitsuru c/o NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 04 /
MURAI, Yoshihisa c/o NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober, Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06796542.6 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006JP316231 | Priority number, date | JP20050240137 | 22.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005240137 | JP20050325835 | 10.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005325835 | [2008/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007023736 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930040 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930040 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/28, A61M5/00 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
A61M5/28 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3104 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3117 (EP,US);
A61M5/001 (EP,US);
A61M5/002 (EP,US);
A61M5/3145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERTIGSPRITZE | [2008/24] | English: | PREFILLED SYRINGE | [2008/24] | French: | SERINGUE PRÉREMPLIE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2008 | Translation filed | 19.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2011 | BE | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | LT | 16.03.2011 | LV | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | PL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | ES | 27.06.2011 | IS | 16.07.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | IE | 18.08.2011 | LU | 18.08.2011 | FR | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
LU | 18.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
LU | 18.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.03.2011 | |
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3149717 (CHARLES CASTELLI) [Y] 4-8 * abstract *; | [Y]US3468471 (LINDER FRITZ) [Y] 4-8 * abstract *; | [Y]US3503497 (RIELY PHYLLIS, et al) [Y] 4-8* figure 2 *; | [Y]US4624660 (MIJERS JAN W M [NL], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]US5147309 (HEMMERICH KARL J [US], et al) [Y] 4-8 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0687477 (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * [Y] 1-9; | [XY]FR2781682 (AGUETTANT LAB [FR]) [X] 1-3,9 * page 3, line 1 - line 26 * [Y] 1-9 |