EP1930475 - SURFACE-CONDITIONING COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND SURFACE CONDITIONING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 2-1-2, Oyodokita, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8511 / JP | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INBE, Toshio, NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD. 4-1-15, Minamishinagawa, Sinagawa-ku Tokyo 1408675 / JP | 02 /
MATSUKAWA, Masahiko, NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD 4-1-15, Minamishinagawa, Sinagawa-ku Tokyo 1408675 / JP | 03 /
KIKUCHI, Kotaro, NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD. 4-1-15, Minamishinagawa, Sinagawa-ku Tokyo 1408675 / JP | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06796607.7 | 21.08.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006JP316344 | Priority number, date | JP20050239235 | 19.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005239235 | [2008/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007021025 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930475 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/78, C23C22/80 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
C23C22/78 (EP,US);
C23C2222/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENKONDITIONIERUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND OBERFLÄCHENKONDITIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2008/24] | English: | SURFACE-CONDITIONING COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND SURFACE CONDITIONING METHOD | [2008/24] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE SURFACE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION IDOINE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE SURFACE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2008 | Translation filed | 26.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 14.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1378586 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 3, paragraphs 12-15 * * page 4, paragraph 23 - page 5, paragraph 40 * * page 6, paragraph 52 - page 7, paragraph 60 * * claims 1-4 *; | [PX]EP1566465 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4-7 * page 3, paragraphs 11-18 * * page 4, paragraphs 21,22,27 * * page 5, paragraph 38 - page 6, paragraph 46 * * page 7, paragraph 54 * * page 8, paragraphs 65, 67-69 * * page 9, paragraphs 71,75 * * page 11, paragraphs 90-94 * * paragraph [0104]; example 4 * * claims 1-7 *; | [PX]EP1566466 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4-7 * page 3, paragraph 9 - page 5, paragraph 16 * * page 5, paragraph 20 - page 6, paragraph 27 * * page 10, paragraphs 71-74 * * page 11, paragraphs 78-80 * * page 12, paragraph 94 - page 13, paragraph 99 * * page 14, paragraphs 103-107,109,113 * * page 16, paragraphs 127-132 ** claims 1-8 * | Examination | WO0005066 | WO2007117044 | EP1930473 |