EP1932835 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2,3-DIHYDROPYRIDAZINE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Kazuaki 13-32, Hoshimi-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0843 / JP | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/15] |
Former [2013/52] | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/25] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06796833.9 | 22.08.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006JP316797 | Priority number, date | JP20050248844 | 30.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005248844 | [2008/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007026624 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1932835 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1932835 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/20 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
C07D237/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61P33/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER 2,3-DIHYDROPYRIDAZINVERBINDUNG | [2008/25] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2,3-DIHYDROPYRIDAZINE COMPOUND | [2008/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ 2,3-DIHYDROPYRIDAZINE | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2008 | Translation filed | 18.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.12.2013 | BE | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | IE | 22.08.2014 | LU | 22.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.08.2014 | ||
LU | 22.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.08.2014 | ||
LU | 22.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.08.2014 | ||
LU | 22.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE414146 (FRITZ REINDEL DR) [Y] 1-8* page 1, left column, lines 25-35 *; | [Y]DE451733 (A E TSCHITSCHIBABIN DR) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, right column, lines 102-116 *; | [Y] - JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS 200505 GB, (200505), vol. 48, no. 6, ISSN 0362-4803, pages 397 - 406, XP002573779 [Y] 1-8 * compound 2, page 398 and page 400-401 * |