EP1923427 - BIODEGRADABLE RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED BODY OBTAINED FROM SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITIKA LTD. 50, Higashi-Hommachi 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0824 / JP | [2008/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAHARA, Mitsuhiro c/o UNITIKA LTD. 23, Uji Kozakura, Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0021 / JP | 02 /
NAKAI, Miho c/o UNITIKA LTD: 23, Uji Kozakura, Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0021 / JP | 03 /
UEDA, Kazue c/o UNITIKA LTD. 23, Uji Kozakura, Uji-shi Kyoto / JP | [2011/42] |
Former [2008/21] | 01 /
KAWAHARA, Mitsuhiro c/o UNITIKA LTD. 23, Uji Kozakura, Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0021 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAI, Miho c/o UNITIKA LTD: 23, Uji Kozakura, Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0021 / JP | |||
03 /
UEDA, Kazue c/o UNITIKA LTD. 23, Uji Kozakura, Uji-shi Kyoto / JP | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | ||
Former [2011/42] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2008/21] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 06797032.7 | 30.08.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006JP317057 | Priority number, date | JP20050260910 | 08.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005260910 | JP20050262273 | 09.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005262273 | [2008/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007029574 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923427 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1923427 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00, C08L101/16 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (KR);
C08L101/16 (KR);
B29C2049/023 (EP);
B29C48/0017 (EP);
B29C48/04 (EP);
B29C49/0005 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP);
B29C49/061 (EP);
B29C49/10 (EP);
B29K2067/003 (EP);
B29K2079/085 (EP);
B29K2091/00 (EP);
B29K2105/26 (EP);
B29K2279/08 (EP);
B29L2031/712 (EP);
B29L2031/7678 (EP);
C08K5/29 (EP);
C08L91/00 (EP,US);
C08L91/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/04, C08L91/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMKÖRPER DARAUS | [2008/21] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED BODY OBTAINED FROM SAME | [2008/21] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE BIODEGRADABLE ET CORPS MOULE OBTENU A PARTIR DE LADITE COMPOSITION | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | Translation filed | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 18.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2006 | AT | 19.10.2011 | BE | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | IT | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | PL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | ES | 30.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09100395 (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER, et al); | [X]JPH11106628 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [X]EP1029890 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]); | [X]DE10104829 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]JP2003268223 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2004352844 (RIKEN TECHNOS CORP); | [X]US2005136271 (GERMROTH TED C [US], et al) |