EP1939198 - NOVEL ADENINE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Kazuki c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kas ugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5540022 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Tomoaki c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kas ugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5540022 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Kei c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 1-98, Kasugadenaka 3-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0022 / JP | 04 /
KURIMOTO, Ayumu c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kas ugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5540022 / JP | 05 /
ISOBE, Yoshiaki c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kas ugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5540022 / JP | 06 /
OGITA, Haruhisa 243-308, Hongo-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitam 3310802 / JP | 07 /
MILLICHIP, Ian c/o AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Department of Medicinal Chemistry, Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE115RH / GB | 08 /
MCINALLY, Thomas c/o AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Department of Medicinal Chemistry, Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE115RH / GB | 09 /
BONNERT, Roger c/o AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Department of Medicinal Chemistry, Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE115RH / GB | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Kazuki c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kas ugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5540022 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA, Tomoaki c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kas ugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5540022 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMURA, Kei c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kas ugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5540022 / JP | |||
04 /
KURIMOTO, Ayumu c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kas ugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5540022 / JP | |||
05 /
ISOBE, Yoshiaki c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 1-98, Kas ugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5540022 / JP | |||
06 /
OGITA, Haruhisa 243-308, Hongo-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitam 3310802 / JP | |||
07 /
MILLICHIP, Ian c/o AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Department of Medicinal Chemistry, Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE115RH / GB | |||
08 /
MCINALLY, Thomas c/o AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Department of Medicinal Chemistry, Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE115RH / GB | |||
09 /
BONNERT, Roger c/o AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Department of Medicinal Chemistry, Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE115RH / GB | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06798198.5 | 21.09.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006JP318756 | Priority number, date | JP20050276171 | 22.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005276171 | [2008/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007034881 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1939198 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/18, A61K31/522, A61K31/5377, A61P11/02, A61P11/06, A61P17/00, A61P27/02, A61P31/12, A61P31/18, A61P35/00, A61P37/02, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, C07D473/16, C07D473/24, C07D473/34 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
C07D473/18 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | NEUE ADENINVERBINDUNG | [2008/27] | English: | NOVEL ADENINE COMPOUND | [2008/27] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSE D'ADENINE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2008 | Translation filed | 18.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |