EP1930384 - INK FOR JET PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/28] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Dainippon Ink and Chemicals, Incorporated 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAGAI, Akio Dainippon Ink and Chemicals Inc. Saitama Plant 4472-1 Oaza Komuro Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | 02 /
SHIMAMURA, Yoshinosuke Dainippon Ink and Chemicals Inc. Saitama Plant 4472-1 Oaza Komuro Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Shigehiro Dainippon Ink and Chemicals Inc. Saitama Plant 4472-1Oaza Komuro Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | 04 /
OBAYASHI, Ryouichi Dainippon Ink and Chemicals Inc. Sakai Plant 3 Takasago 1-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka 592-0001 / JP | [2011/52] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
KUMAGAI, Akio Dainippon Ink and Chemicals Inc. Saitama Plant 4472-1 Oaza Komuro Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIMAMURA, Yoshinosuke Dainippon Ink and Chemicals Inc. Saitama Plant 4472-1 Oaza Komuro Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA, Shigehiro Dainippon Ink and Chemicals Inc. Saitama Plant 4472-1Oaza Komuro Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | |||
04 /
OBAYASHI, Ryouichi Dainippon Ink and Chemicals Inc. Sakai Plant 3 Takasago 1-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka 592-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06798464.1 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006JP319496 | Priority number, date | JP20050287027 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005287027 | [2008/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007037387 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930384 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930384 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, E04F13/08 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24851 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/48] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TINTE FÜR STRAHLDRUCKER | [2008/24] | English: | INK FOR JET PRINTER | [2008/24] | French: | ENCRE POUR IMPRIMANTE A JET | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | Translation filed | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 03.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1603062 (WHITTAKER CORP) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US2004068031 (HORIE SEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0158]; example -; claim 3 * |