EP1945802 - METHOD TO DIAGNOSE OR SCREEN FOR INFLAMMATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GD Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREXHAGE, Hemmo Arjan Emmalaan 65 NL-3051 JD Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
BENNER, Robbert Middeldijk 25 NL-2992 SH Barendrecht / NL | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06799503.5 | 11.10.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006NL00514 | Priority number, date | EP20050077341 | 12.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05077341 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007043869 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1945802 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
G01N2800/304 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Extension states | AL | 13.05.2008 | BA | 13.05.2008 | HR | 13.05.2008 | MK | 13.05.2008 | RS | 13.05.2008 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE ODER ZUM SCREENING ENTZÜNDLICHER KRANKHEITEN | [2008/30] | English: | METHOD TO DIAGNOSE OR SCREEN FOR INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | [2008/30] | French: | METHODE DE DIAGNOSTIC OU DE DEPISTAGE DE MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03039490 (TECHNOLOGY LICENSING STANFORD [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004085614 (MCLEAN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X] - ZINK MATHIAS ET AL, "Antidepressants differentially affect expression of complexin I and II RNA in rat hippocampus.", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY. SEP 2005, (200509), vol. 181, no. 3, ISSN 0033-3158, pages 560 - 565, XP002368085 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 564 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00213-005-0017-4 | [X] - OHNAMI S ET AL, "Expression profiles of pancreatic cancer cell lines infected with antisense K-ras-expressing adenoviral vector", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20031003), vol. 309, no. 4, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 798 - 803, XP004455811 [X] 9 * abstract * * page 800 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2003.08.073 | [X] - IGAZ L M ET AL, "One-trial aversive learning induces late changes in hippocampal CaMKIIalpha, Homer 1a, Syntaxin 1a and ERK2 protein levels", MOLECULAR BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041206), vol. 132, no. 1, ISSN 0169-328X, pages 1 - 12, XP004645590 [X] 9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molbrainres.2004.08.016 | [A] - IWAMOTO K ET AL, "Molecular characterization of bipolar disorder by comparing gene expression profiles of postmortem brains of major mental disorders.", MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY. APR 2004, (200404), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1359-4184, pages 406 - 416, XP002368086 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.mp.4001437 | [A] - EVANS S J ET AL, "Comparison of gene expression profiles between bipolar disorder, major depression and schizophrenia in cortical brain regions.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER, & 33RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NEUROSCIENCE; NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA; NOVEMBER 08-12, 2003, (2003), vol. 2003, pages Abstract No. 312.15 URL - http://sf, XP009061887 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - LI J ET AL, "Identification of differentially expressed genes in two cortical regions of patients with mood disorders by serial analysis of gene expression ( sage ) .", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER, & 33RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NEUROSCIENCE; NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA; NOVEMBER 08-12, 2003, (2003), vol. 2003, pages Abstract No. 779.5 URL - http://sf, XP009061888 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - TOMITA H ET AL, "Gene expression profiles in postmortem brains of mood disorder patients.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER, & 33RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NEUROSCIENCE; NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA; NOVEMBER 08-12, 2003, (2003), vol. 2003, pages Abstract No. 640.19 URL - http://sf, XP009061886 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - TSUANG MING T ET AL, "Assessing the validity of blood-based gene expression profiles for the classification of schizophrenia and bipolar disorder: A preliminary report", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL GENETICS, (20050205), vol. 133B, no. 1, ISSN 0148-7299, pages 1 - 5, XP002368087 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - SUN Y ET AL, "Serial analysis of gene expression in the frontal cortex of patients with bipolar disorder.", THE BRITISH JOURNAL OF PSYCHIATRY. SUPPLEMENT. JUN 2001, (200106), vol. 41, ISSN 0960-5371, pages s137 - s141, XP002368088 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1192/bjp.178.41.s137 | [A] - TKACHEV DMITRI ET AL, "Oligodendrocyte dysfunction in schizophrenia and bipolar disorder.", LANCET. 6 SEP 2003, (20030906), vol. 362, no. 9386, ISSN 1474-547X, pages 798 - 805, XP004779174 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(03)14289-4 | [A] - BEZCHLIBNYK YAREMA B ET AL, "Gene expression differences in bipolar disorder revealed by cDNA array analysis of post-mortem frontal cortex", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (200111), vol. 79, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3042, pages 826 - 834, XP002319164 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1471-4159.2001.00628.x | [A] - BUNNEY WILLIAM E ET AL, "Microarray technology: a review of new strategies to discover candidate vulnerability genes in psychiatric disorders.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PSYCHIATRY. APR 2003, (200304), vol. 160, no. 4, ISSN 0002-953X, pages 657 - 666, XP002993289 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1176/appi.ajp.160.4.657 | [A] - NICULESCU ALEXANDER B III ET AL, "Convergent functional genomics: Application to bipolar disorder", ANNALS OF MEDICINE, (200105), vol. 33, no. 4, ISSN 0785-3890, pages 263 - 271, XP009061915 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - KELSOE JOHN R ET AL, "Finding genes for bipolar disorder in the functional genomics era: from convergent functional genomics to phenomics and back.", CNS SPECTRUMS. MAR 2002, (200203), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1092-8529, pages 215 - 216 , 223, XP009062014 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |