EP1913777 - VIRTUAL DISCOVERY OF CONTENT AVAILABLE TO A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dell Products, L.P. One Dell Way Round Rock, TX 78682 / US | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHER, Timothy 1230 Brentwood Street Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
ROSS, Mark, A. 3344 Melendy Drive San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 03 /
NICHOLS, Timothy, C. 685 Benvenue Avenue Los Altos CA 94024 / US | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G. Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Hess, Peter K. G. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06800613.9 | 31.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US29948 | Priority number, date | US20050193828 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: US 193828 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007016568 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1913777 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
H04H60/65 (EP,US);
H04N21/433 (KR);
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04H60/46 (EP,US);
H04N21/23109 (EP,US);
H04N21/4135 (EP,US);
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/4668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/6112 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N21/6143 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N5/50 (EP,US);
H04H60/33 (EP,US);
H04H60/43 (EP,US);
H04H60/47 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | VIRTUELLE ENTDECKUNG VON EINER EINRICHTUNG VERFÜGBAREM INHALT | [2008/17] | English: | VIRTUAL DISCOVERY OF CONTENT AVAILABLE TO A DEVICE | [2008/17] | French: | DECOUVERTE VIRTUELLE DE CONTENU DISPONIBLE POUR UN DISPOSITIF | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 11.04.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 06.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/38] | 16.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/38] | 03.05.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005020223 (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,14-16,19,20 * figures 13,75 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0021] , [0025] , [0035] , [0039] - [0041] - [0044] , [0049] , [0050] , [0173] , [0181] - [0185] * * paragraphs [0195] , [0221] , [0236] , [0255] - [0256] - [0508] - [0511] * | International search | [X]US2004158860 (CROW WILLIAM M [US]); | [Y]US2002174430 (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [Y]US2002120925 (LOGAN JAMES D [US]); | [A]US2002013852 (JANIK CRAIG [US]); | [A]US2002010759 (HITSON BRUCE L [US], et al); | [A]US2003093790 (LOGAN JAMES D [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005020223 |