EP1912575 - PERCUTANEOUS TISSUE EXCISION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/17] | PERCUTANEOUS TISSUE EXCISION DEVICES AND METHODS | ||
[2010/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertos Medical, Inc. 2362 -D Qume Drive San Jose CA 95131 / US | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAN, Minh 10227 Kleinbrook Way Highlands Ranch, CO 80126 / US | 02 /
WAY, Bryce 7141 Cerro Crest Drive San Jose, CA 95138 / US | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
TRAN, Minh 10227 Kleinbrook Way Highlands Ranch, CO 80126 / US | ||
02 /
WAY, Bryce 226 Vista Roma Way San Jose, CA 95136 / US | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06800718.6 | 31.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US30302 | Priority number, date | US20050704224P | 29.07.2005 Original published format: US 704224 P | US20060747166P | 12.05.2006 Original published format: US 747166 P | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007016686 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1912575 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1912575 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/06 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B17/1608 (EP,US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61M5/007 (US);
A61B10/06 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/295 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00261 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00336 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00685 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0646 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0647 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2911 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2925 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | A61B17/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERKUTANE GEWEBEEXZISIONSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2010/36] | English: | PERCUTANEOUS TISSUE EXCISION DEVICES | [2010/36] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'EXCISION PERCUTANEE DE TISSUS | [2010/36] |
Former [2008/17] | PERKUTANE GEWEBEEXZISIONSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2008/17] | PERCUTANEOUS TISSUE EXCISION DEVICES AND METHODS | ||
Former [2008/17] | DISPOSITIFS ET METHODES D'EXCISION PERCUTANEE DE TISSUS | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11150538.4 / EP2335600 | EP17166627.4 / EP3228265 | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2011 | BE | 19.01.2011 | CY | 19.01.2011 | CZ | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | IT | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | PL | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SE | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | ES | 30.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | IE | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | LU | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
IE | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
LU | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
IE | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
LU | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
IE | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 19.01.2011 | |
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 19.01.2011 | |
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9629936 (SYMBIOSIS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 2,4 *; | [X]US5637096 (YOON INBAE [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 6, line 12 - line 63; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US6110127 (SUZUKI TAKAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-13 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 41; figures 6a-c *; | [PX]WO2006015302 (STEN X [US], et al) [PX] 1,19* paragraphs [0074] - [0077]; figures 21-24; claims 28,29 * | International search | [X]US4200111 (HARRIS ARTHUR M [US]); | [X]US6110127 (SUZUKI TAKAYUKI [JP]); | [X]US6142957 (DIAMOND BRUCE H [US], et al) | Examination | WO9622056 | by applicant | WO9622056 | WO9629936 | US5637096 | US6110127 | WO2006015302 |