04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
10.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
16.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] |
25.11.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
18.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
11.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
28.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
16.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
09.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
26.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] |
19.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
12.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
14.01.2011 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
17.12.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
17.12.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
07.12.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.12.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.08.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.08.2010 |
Change - German title |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
06.08.2010 |
Change - English title |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
06.08.2010 |
Change - French title |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.07.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.03.2010 |
First examination report |
|
04.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.02.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.10.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
31.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
08.05.2009 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
12.09.2008 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
21.03.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
21.03.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
19.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|