Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8882772 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2014 | B2 | US2014024933 | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46104506 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US201314032770 | 20.09.2013 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8894653 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2014 | B2 | US2014005671 | 02.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46104506 | 31.07.2006 | US201314019135 | 05.09.2013 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8696671 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2014 | B2 | US2007055215 | 08.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46104506 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007027464 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46103606 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009502365 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30302 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3228265 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2018 | A3 | EP3228265 | 11.10.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06800718 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | EP11150538 | 31.07.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2335600 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2017 | B1 | EP2335600 | 22.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06800718 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1912575 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2011 | B1 | EP1912575 | 25.11.2009 | A4 | EP1912575 | 23.04.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30302 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE495701T | 15.02.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30302 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2614721 | 08.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30302 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006019736D1 | 03.03.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30302 | 31.07.2006 | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USD620593S | 27.07.2010 | S | Priority number | Date | US46104506 | 31.07.2006 | US32462108 | 16.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007016686 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2009 | A3 | WO2007016686 | 08.02.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007016683 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2009 | A3 | WO2007016683 | 08.02.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2637638T | 16.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US74716606 | 12.05.2006 | US70422405 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Divisional application | EP2335600 | EP3228265 |