EP1917683 - POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH INTERCONNECTED GATE TRENCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies Americas Corp. 101 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [2017/03] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL RECTIFIER CORPORATION 233 Kansas Street El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Ling 941 West Carson Street 310 Torrance, California 90502 / US | 02 /
AMALI, Adam I. 4766 West 134th Street, Apt. 4 Hawthorne, California 90250 / US | 03 /
TURNER, Russell 1 Trelawny Close, Castle Oak, Usk Monmouthshire, South Wales NP15 1SP / GB | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Weitzel, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/19] | Feldkamp, Rainer, et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06801678.1 | 16.08.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006US32060 | Priority number, date | US20050709020P | 17.08.2005 Original published format: US 709020 P | US20060504740 | 15.08.2006 Original published format: US 504740 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007022316 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1917683 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L29/423, // H01L29/40, H01L29/417, H01L29/739 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,US);
H01L29/4238 (EP);
H01L29/7811 (EP,US);
H01L29/407 (EP);
H01L29/41766 (EP);
H01L29/4236 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/19] | H01L29/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Title | German: | STROMHALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBUNDENEN GATE-GRÄBEN | [2008/19] | English: | POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH INTERCONNECTED GATE TRENCHES | [2008/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE PUISSANCE COMPRENANT DES TRANCHEES DE GRILLE INTERCONNECTEES | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 11.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 18.03.2011 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/01] | 24.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2017 | 15.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01192174 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [X]WO0042665 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 7, line 3 from bottom - page 9, line 25; figure 1 * * page 10, last line - page 16, line 4; figures 4A-4D * * page 17, line 10 - page 18, line 18; figures 6, 7 *; | [A]US6309929 (HSU CHIH-WEI [TW], et al) [A] 1,3* column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 47; figures 6-9 *; | [X]EP1351313 (SILICONIX INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0031]; figures 16A-16C * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0055]; figures 20A-20F,21A-21I * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0095]; figures 25A-25F * | International search | [X]US6833583 ; | [Y]US6838735 ; | [Y]US6580123 ; | [A]US2003127702 ; | [A]US5430315 | Examination | JPH10214968 | US2004173844 |