EP1940915 - PROCESS FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF SILYLATED RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc.s 22 Corporate Woods Boulevard Albany, NY 12211 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 22 Corporate Woods Boulevard Albany, NY 12211 / US | ||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 187 Danbury Road Wilton, CT 06897 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANEVICIUS, John, P. 11 Hollandale Lane Apartment C Duncan, NY 12065 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Misty 117 Bellows Lane New City, NY 10956 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
BANEVICIUS, John, P. 11 Hollandale Lane Apartment C Duncan, NY 12065 / US | ||
02 /
HUANG, Misty 117 Bellows Lane New City, NY 10956 / US | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06801710.2 | 17.08.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US32104 | Priority number, date | US20050226694 | 14.09.2005 Original published format: US 226694 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007037824 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1940915 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940915 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/48, C08G18/83, C08G18/10, C08G18/71, C09D175/04, C09J175/04, C09K3/10, B01J19/24 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
C09K3/1021 (EP,BR,US);
C08G18/0895 (EP,BR,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B01J19/24 (KR);
C08G18/48 (EP,BR,US);
C08G18/71 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/718 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON SILYLIERTEM HARZ | [2008/28] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF SILYLATED RESIN | [2008/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION EN CONTINU DE RESINE SILYLEE | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10012878.4 / EP2287228 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2006 | AT | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IE | 17.08.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | LU | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IE | 17.08.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IE | 17.08.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1535940 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9,13-20 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] - [0017] - [0048] , [0051] , [0052] * * claim - *; | [A]US6350824 (BAUMANN FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-9,13-22 * column 7, lines 39-50; table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE2636709 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH) [A] 1-9,13-22 * claim - *; | [A]DE10237270 (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE]) [A] 1-9,13-22 * examples 1-6 *; | [A]WO03018658 (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE], et al) [A] 1-9,13-22 * examples 4,5,7,9-11 *; | [E]WO2006136261 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-9,13-22 * examples 1,2; claim - * | Examination | EP0950680 | by applicant | US3905929 |