EP1915466 - METHODS FOR PREPARING HYBRID SUBSTRATES COMPRISING DNA AND ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanosphere, Inc. 4088 Commercial Avenue Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STORHOFF, James, J. 1735 Washngton Street Evanston, IL 60202 / US | 02 /
SENICAL, Michael, J. 2049 W.Moise Ave. Unit 3 Chicago, IL 60645 / US | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Nikolaistrasse 15 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06801832.4 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006US32301 | Priority number, date | US20050709613P | 19.08.2005 Original published format: US 709613 P | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007024676 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1915466 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1915466 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/543 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
G01N33/54386 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00547 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00572 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00605 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0061 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00612 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00637 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00641 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2525/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HYBRIDSUBSTRATEN MIT DNA UND ANTIKÖRPERN SOWIE VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2008/18] | English: | METHODS FOR PREPARING HYBRID SUBSTRATES COMPRISING DNA AND ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2008/18] | French: | PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE SUBSTRATS HYBRIDES COMPRENANT DE L'ADN ET DES ANTICORPS ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 26.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | BE | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | IT | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | LV | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | IE | 18.08.2011 | LU | 18.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
LU | 18.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
LU | 18.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02079490 (NANOSPHERE INC [US], et al); | [A]US2004115794 (BRUBAKER SHANE [US]); | [X]WO2004076678 (PRITEST INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2004081575 (BIOINVENT INT AB [SE], et al); | [DX]WO2005003394 (NANOSPHERE INC [US], et al); | [PX]WO2005113817 (NANOSPHERE INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US5270163 | US5567588 | WO2004076678 |