EP2004003 - DISPOSABLE PIERCED EARRING FRAGRANCE CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robbins-Sullivan, Kathryn S. 2650 Mission Street Suite 209 San Marino CA 91108 / US | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Lunt, Mark George Francis HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Lunt, Mark George Francis Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06801932.2 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/52] | WO2006US32467 | Priority number, date | US20060328598 | 11.01.2006 Original published format: US 328598 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007081405 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2004003 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A44C15/00, A44C7/00 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
A61L9/12 (EP,US);
A44C15/002 (EP,US);
A44C7/00 (EP,US);
A61L9/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | A44C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINWEGDUFTKAMMER FÜR OHRRINGE | [2008/52] | English: | DISPOSABLE PIERCED EARRING FRAGRANCE CHAMBER | [2008/52] | French: | CHAMBRE JETABLE À PARFUM SUR BOUCLE POUR OREILLE PERCÉE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 24.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 24.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 24.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 24.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2003061831 (TSUTSUMI YOJI [JP]); | [Y]US5031419 (GELMAN EMANUEL [US]) | by applicant | US4159631 | US4353370 | US4452052 | US6662596 | US152197 |