22.07.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
25.03.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.09.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.12.2009 |
First examination report |
|
27.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.09.2009 |
Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
29.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
17.07.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
17.07.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
21.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
21.11.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
18.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
04.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
01.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
28.10.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|