Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7896256 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2011 | B2 | US2009260393 | 22.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32859806 | 11.01.2006 | US25538708 | 21.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2004003 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2009 | A4 | EP2004003 | 24.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US32467 | 18.08.2006 | US32859806 | 11.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2636758 | 19.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US32467 | 18.08.2006 | US32859806 | 11.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007081405 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2007 | A3 | WO2007081405 | 19.07.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32859806 | 11.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007158455 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32859806 | 11.01.2006 |