EP1922708 - ENHANCED METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING AND RENDERING PERFORMANCE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nintendo of America, Inc. 4820 150th Avenue, N.E. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2008/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Darren, C. Nintendo of America Inc. 4820 150th Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06801963.7 | 21.08.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006US32538 | Priority number, date | US20050207194 | 19.08.2005 Original published format: US 207194 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007022487 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1922708 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G09B9/04 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
A63F13/12 (EP);
A63F13/537 (US);
A63F13/00 (US);
A63F13/20 (US);
A63F13/30 (EP);
A63F13/31 (US);
A63F13/323 (US);
A63F13/327 (US);
A63F13/355 (US);
A63F13/46 (US);
A63F13/52 (US);
A63F13/525 (US);
A63F13/5252 (US);
A63F13/5258 (US);
A63F13/63 (US);
A63F13/795 (US);
A63F13/803 (US);
A63F13/86 (US);
A63F13/92 (US);
A63F13/95 (US);
G06F3/04815 (US);
G09B19/22 (EP,US);
A63F2300/513 (EP,US);
A63F2300/554 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | ERWEITERTE METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWAHL UND WIEDERGABE VON PERFORMANCE-DATEN | [2008/21] | English: | ENHANCED METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING AND RENDERING PERFORMANCE DATA | [2008/21] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL AMELIORES ASSURANT LA SELECTION ET LE RENDU DES DONNEES DE PERFORMANCE | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 24.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/12] | Divisional application(s) | EP17191640.6 / EP3276593 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6488505 (HIGHTOWER AARON [US]) [I] 1-16,24-32 * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 36 * * column 9, lines 49-56 *; | [I]JP2003093745 (DOWANGO KK) [I] 1-16,24-32 * abstract *; | [I]JP2003320164 (TAITO CORP) [I] 1-16,24-32* abstract *; | [I]US2004224741 (JEN JAMES [US], et al) [I] 1-16,24-32 * paragraphs [0016] - [0087]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2004225386 (THOMPSON GARY [US], et al) [I] 1-16,24-32 * paragraphs [0001] - [0093]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US6115036 (YAMATO SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US6366283 (TAMPIERI FILIPPO [CA]); | [A]WO02061707 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al); | [A]US2002142846 (PAULSEN CRAIG A [US]); | [Y]US6488505 (HIGHTOWER AARON [US]); | [Y]US6658464 (REISMAN RICHARD R [US]); | [A]US6755654 (HIGHTOWER AARON [US]); | [A]US6884171 (ECK CHARLES P [US], et al) | Examination | JP2002301266 | JP2004180951 | US2004164897 | by applicant | US2004224741 |