EP1917155 - HYBRID VEHICLE WITH MODULAR SOLAR PANEL AND BATTERY CHARGING SYSTEM TO SUPPLEMENT REGENERATIVE BRAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ward, Thomas A. 1146 Larch Avenue Moraga, California 94556 / US | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2008/19] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06802306.8 | 23.08.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006US33166 | Priority number, date | US20050710996P | 24.08.2005 Original published format: US 710996 P | US20050714688P | 06.09.2005 Original published format: US 714688 P | US20060816956P | 27.06.2006 Original published format: US 816956 P | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007025096 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1917155 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60L8/00, B60L11/00, H02J7/00 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
B60L8/003 (EP,US);
B60L50/51 (EP,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
H02J7/35 (EP,US);
B60L2210/10 (EP,US);
B60L2210/12 (EP,US);
B60L2210/14 (EP,US);
B60L2250/10 (EP,US);
H02J2310/44 (EP);
H02J2310/48 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Title | German: | HYBRIDFAHRZEUG MIT MODULAREM SONNENKOLLEKTOR UND BATTERIELADESYSTEM ZUR EINSPARUNG VON BREMSVORGÄNGEN ZUR REGENERATION | [2008/19] | English: | HYBRID VEHICLE WITH MODULAR SOLAR PANEL AND BATTERY CHARGING SYSTEM TO SUPPLEMENT REGENERATIVE BRAKING | [2008/19] | French: | VEHICULE HYBRIDE EQUIPE D'UN SYSTEME DE PANNEAUX SOLAIRES MODULAIRES ET DE CHARGEMENT DE BATTERIE EN COMPLEMENT DU FREINAGE PAR RECUPERATION | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 25.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002146617 (JOHNSON PHILIP STANLEY [US], et al) [X] 1,6,16,20,21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0020] , [0022] , [0028] , [0034]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-5,7,10,12-15,24,25,27,28,30; | [XY]JP2004221521 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY) [X] 22 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [XY]US6448740 (KIRKPATRICK MARK A [US]) [X] 23,26,29 * abstract * * column 4, line 29 - column 7, line 62; figures 3,5 * [Y] 2,4,24,27; | [Y]JPH1128991 (NISSEI KINZOKU KK) [Y] 5,30 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0424577 (MAHARISHI TECHNOLOGY CORP B V [NL]) [Y] 10 * abstract * * column 5, line 23 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2000174308 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 12,13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5905356 (WELLS GILBERT MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 3,25,28 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004055632 (MAZUMDER MALAY K [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * abstract *; | [Y]US2005083722 (EMORI AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 30 * paragraphs [0023] , [0040] , [0063] - [0067] - [0076] - [0079]; figures 9,11 *; | [A]ES2135318 (LUMBIER LARRAYA RUFINO [ES]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]JPH05111112 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract *; | [A]FR2855793 (MELLO SERGE [FR], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004049540 (TIAX LLC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11227548 (SEKISUI JUSHI KK) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US4090577 (MOORE WALLACE H) [A] * the whole document * | by applicant | US19880607146 | US19560608169 |