|
11.09.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
05.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.05.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
International search report |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |